ND HB1328 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06-37, subsection 3 of section 39-20-03.1, subsection 2 of section 39-20-03.2, and section 39-20-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to surrendering driver's license, mailing of temporary operator's permit, and venue of administrative hearings.
Title
Surrendering driver's license, mailing of temporary operator's permit, and venue of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |