ND HB1318 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the state aid funding formula for elementary and secondary education.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the state aid funding formula for elementary and secondary education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 31 |
2017-04-07 | House | Concurred |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 31 |
2017-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |