ND 1311 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees for littering on the highway; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The amount of statutory fees for littering on the highway; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Governor 03/24
2017-03-22HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-22SenateSigned by President
2017-03-21HouseReturned to House
2017-03-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6
2017-03-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-21SenateReceived from House
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 37
2017-02-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-02-03HouseRereferred to Transportation
2017-02-02HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-01-30HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback