ND 1300 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection? 2 of section 28-32-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agencies exempt from the definition of administrative agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agencies exempt from the definition of administrative agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21HouseSigned by Governor 04/20
2017-04-18HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-18SenateSigned by President
2017-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3
2017-04-17SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-13HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2017-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Unruh Cook Armstrong
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Klemin K. Koppelman Hanson
2017-04-07HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-05HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
2017-04-05SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-04SenateLaid over one legislative day
2017-04-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2017-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-01SenateRereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-01SenateRequest return from committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback