ND HB1290 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-12-09, 57-15-02.1, and 57-20-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notices of property assessment increases, hearings on proposed property tax increases, and contents of property tax statements; to provide for a study; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Notices of property assessment increases, hearings on proposed property tax increases, and contents of property tax statements; to provide for a study; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 41 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 3 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 20 |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Appoint Rep. Owens to replace Rep. Belter on conference committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Cook to replace Sen. Burckhard on conference committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Appoint Rep. Belter to replace Rep. Owens on conference committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard Miller Triplett |
2013-04-17 | House | Appoint Rep. Owens to replace Rep. Belter on conference committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Headland Belter Zaiser |
2013-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 35 nays 9 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 57 nays 31 |
2013-02-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |