ND HB1282 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 069
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 069
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Horne, Lyson, Mathern A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 11-18-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statements of full consideration for property sales which must be filed with the state board of equalization or the recorder.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Horne, Lyson, Mathern A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 11-18-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statements of full consideration for property sales which must be filed with the state board of equalization or the recorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 069 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1282.html |