ND HB1264 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-10-17 and 15-10-28, subsection 1 of section 54-44.4-11, section 54-52.6-02, and subsection 6 of section 54-65-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonresident tuition rates; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Nonresident tuition rates; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 53 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |