ND 1264 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 44-04-18.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting law enforcement officer and firefighter body camera images from open records requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting law enforcement officer and firefighter body camera images from open records requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16HouseSigned by Governor 04/15
2015-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-13SenateSigned by President
2015-04-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5
2015-04-09HouseConcurred
2015-03-23HouseReturned to House (12)
2015-03-20SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2015-03-19SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-18SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2015-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2015-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2015-02-20SenateReceived from House
2015-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3
2015-01-29HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1
2015-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback