ND HB1259 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 23.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to participation in a state or national wastewater surveillance system.
Title
Participation in a state or national wastewater surveillance system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5 |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-13 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2021-01-13 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |