ND 1238 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee Hearing 10:15
Pending: Joint Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 4 @ 10:15 am in Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 16.1-04-02 and 16.1-11.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to polling places.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polling places.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-17SenateReceived from House
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 49 nays 45
2021-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback