ND HB1220 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of secured party notification.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of secured party notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |