ND HB1198 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 39-04-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to motor vehicle registration fees for current and former national guard members; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle registration fees for current and former national guard members; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Silbernagel [R] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Alan Fehr [R] |
Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |