ND HB1190 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 23-20.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the intrastate use of thorium.
Title
The intrastate use of thorium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65 |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1190.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0253-02000.pdf |