ND 1174 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for liability for false medical assistance claims to the state; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for liability for false medical assistance claims to the state; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 77
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 2 0
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback