ND 1169 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-03-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a handgun; to amend and reenact sections 62.1-04-02 and 62.1-04-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying concealed firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carrying concealed firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Governor 03/23
2017-03-23HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-23SenateSigned by President
2017-03-22HouseReturned to House
2017-03-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13
2017-03-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback