ND HB1169 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-03-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a handgun; to amend and reenact sections 62.1-04-02 and 62.1-04-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying concealed firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Carrying concealed firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |