ND HB1166 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 4.1-73-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to freeze branding.
Title
Freeze branding.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |