ND HB1161 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06-03.1, subsection 2 of section 39-06-07, section 39-06-07.1, subsection 3 of section 39-06-19, and subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legal presence for obtaining an operator's license or nondriver identification card, license renewal fees, and commercial driver's license fees.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06-03.1, subsection 2 of section 39-06-07, section 39-06-07.1, subsection 3 of section 39-06-19, and subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legal presence for obtaining an operator's license or nondriver identification card, license renewal fees, and commercial driver's license fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to House | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 039 nays 007 | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 001 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 001 | |
2009-02-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1161.html |