ND HB1159 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding natural gas infrastructure development.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding natural gas infrastructure development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7 |
2021-02-02 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |