ND HB1157 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the physical therapy licensure compact.
Title
The physical therapy licensure compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |