ND HB1126 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12-63-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tribal police officers; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Tribal police officers; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] |
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/16 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10, Emergency clause carried |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 2 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |