ND HB1100 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial driver's license disqualifications.
Title
Commercial driver's license disqualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91 |
2021-01-11 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |