ND HB1058 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonmoving violations; and to repeal section 39-10-51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unattended motor vehicles.
Title
Unattended motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-01-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 0 5 |
2019-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |