ND HB1054 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 37-18.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the administrative committee on veterans' affairs.
Title
The powers and duties of the administrative committee on veterans' affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] |
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2019-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2019-01-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |