ND HB1048 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 10-33-124 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the certified nonprofit development corporation investment tax credit; to repeal section 57-38-01.17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the certified nonprofit development corporation investment tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The certified nonprofit development corporation investment tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2017-03-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |