ND HB1038 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Human Services Committee) AN ACT to provide for the establishment of an autism spectrum disorder database and an autism spectrum disorder voucher program pilot project; to provide for the expansion of the autism spectrum disorder medicaid waiver; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports to the legislative management; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
(Human Services Committee) AN ACT to provide for the establishment of an autism spectrum disorder database and an autism spectrum disorder voucher program pilot project; to provide for the expansion of the autism spectrum disorder medicaid waiver; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports to the legislative management; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2013-04-30 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee Dever Mathern |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference committee appointed Hofstad Fehr Wieland |
2013-04-19 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4 |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 2 2 |
2013-02-14 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |