ND HB1022 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the commission on legal counsel for indigents; to amend and reenact subsection
Title
The commission on legal counsel for indigents; and to provide for a report to the sixty-fifth legislative assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5 |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Appoint Rep. Skarphol to replace Rep. Boehning on conference committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Appoint Rep. Hogan to replace Rep. Glassheim on conference committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kilzer Carlisle Robinson |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Boehning Glassheim |
2015-04-14 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 3 1 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |