ND HB1004 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor; to amend and reenact sections 54-10-10, 54-10-14, and 54-10-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state auditor, political subdivision audits, and occupational and professional board audits; to provide for a prescription drug coverage performance audit; and to provide for legislative management reports.
Title
The salary of the state auditor, political subdivision audits, and occupational and professional board audits; to provide for a prescription drug coverage performance audit; and to provide for legislative management reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2021-04-28 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-04-27 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Appoint Rep. Vigesaa to replace Rep. Bellew on conference committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Oehlke Dever Poolman |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Bellew Howe Mock |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 3 |
2021-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |