NC S912 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ch. SL 2024-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ch. SL 2024-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Elections Changes for Watauga Ed & County Bds
Title
Elections Changes for Watauga Ed & County Bds
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Ch. SL 2024-13 | |
2024-06-27 | Ratified | |
2024-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-19 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-18 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Ratified
Redistricting
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Watauga County
Chaptered
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Ratified
Redistricting
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Watauga County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | 62 | (n/a) | Citation Text |