NC S889 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Ch. SL 2012-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Ch. SL 2012-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
RPO Area Definition
Title
RPO Area Definition
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Christopher Carney [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Thomas Goolsby [R] |
Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. David Rouzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Ch. SL 2012-44 | |
2012-06-20 | Signed By Gov. 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Ratified | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-05 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2012-06-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-04 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-24 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |