NC S883 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mitigation Buffer Rule/Wastewater Treatment
Title
Mitigation Buffer Rule/Wastewater Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Ch. SL 2014-95 | |
2014-08-01 | Signed by Gov. 8/1/2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 07/31/2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Ratified | |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2014 |
2014-07-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-22 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Environmental |
2014-07-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-22 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-21 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Filed |