NC S879 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-21 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-21 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Cornelius Limits/Mecklenburg County Police
Title
Cornelius Limits/Mecklenburg County Police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1128 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government