NC S873 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Access to Affordable College Ed. Act
Title
Access to Affordable College Ed. Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed |