NC S865 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Health Plan/Admin Changes/Local Govts
Title
State Health Plan/Admin Changes/Local Govts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Ch. SL 2016-104 | |
2016-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-29 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2016-06-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-24 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed |