NC S860 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-562
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-562
Summary
Student Protection Fund/Proprietary Schools.
Title
Student Protection Fund/Proprietary Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-562 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-30 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-14 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-09 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-07-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-17 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H980 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S860 |