NC S859 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Ch. SL 2014-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Ch. SL 2014-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cities/Regulation of Vacation Rentals
Title
Cities/Regulation of Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Ch. SL 2014-91 | |
2014-07-31 | Ratified | |
2014-07-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-07-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-24 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Filed |