NC S859 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Ch. SL 2012-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Ch. SL 2012-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pilot Mountain/Dobson Even-Year Elections
Title
Pilot Mountain/Dobson Even-Year Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Don East [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Ch. SL 2012-47 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-20 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-06 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-23 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-05-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Filed |