NC S847 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Ch. SL 2012-194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Ch. SL 2012-194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
GSC Technical Corrections/Other Changes
Title
GSC Technical Corrections/Other Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 93 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-07-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A8 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A7 Rapp\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A6 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A5 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A4 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A3 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Comm. Amd. 2\Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Comm. Amd. 1\Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-07-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A8 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A7 Rapp\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A6 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A5 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A4 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A3 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Comm. Amd. 2\Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Comm. Amd. 1\Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Ch. SL 2012-194 | |
2012-07-17 | Signed By Gov. 7/17/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-07-03 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-07-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 8 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 7 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-07-02 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2012-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-28 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 11 | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Failed 10 | |
2012-06-28 | Amendment Withdrawn 9 | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 8 | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 7 | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2012-06-27 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-06-27 | Amendment Withdrawn 3 | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-22 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2012-05-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1070 (Same As) 2012-05-23 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House