NC S828 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment Insurance Changes
Title
Unemployment Insurance Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - A2 Hackney\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - A1 Ross\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - A2 Hackney\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - A1 Ross\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Ch. SL 2012-134 | |
2012-06-29 | Signed By Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Ratified | |
2012-06-26 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-26 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-21 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-19 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-11 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-08 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-07 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1024 (Same As) 2012-05-22 - Ref To Com On Finance