NC S820 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Ch. SL 2012-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Ch. SL 2012-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clean Energy and Economic Security Act
Title
Clean Energy and Economic Security Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - Veto Override\Clincher\Motion (Y: 71 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Veto Override (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Veto Override\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Motion 11\OVERRIDE VETO (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 2 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A12 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-89 V.8 (Y: 47 N: 62 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A12 Faison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A11 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-91 V.8 (Y: 54 N: 54 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A10 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-90 V.6 (Y: 50 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A10 Faison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 59 N: 44 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A8 Alexander,K\Second Reading\ARI-70 V.3 (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A8 Alexander,K\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A7 Floyd\Second Reading\AMH-102 V.1 (Y: 45 N: 62 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A6 Floyd\Second Reading\AMH-101 V.1 (Y: 48 N: 58 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A6 Floyd\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 56 N: 48 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A5 Harrison\Second Reading\ARI-65 V.3 (Y: 49 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A5 Harrison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A4 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-66 V.5 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A3 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-69 V.1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A2 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-71 V.2 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A1 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-68 V.1 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Veto Override (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Veto Override\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Motion 11\OVERRIDE VETO (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 2 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A12 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-89 V.8 (Y: 47 N: 62 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A12 Faison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A11 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-91 V.8 (Y: 54 N: 54 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A10 Faison\Second Reading\AMH-90 V.6 (Y: 50 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A10 Faison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 59 N: 44 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A8 Alexander,K\Second Reading\ARI-70 V.3 (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A8 Alexander,K\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A7 Floyd\Second Reading\AMH-102 V.1 (Y: 45 N: 62 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A6 Floyd\Second Reading\AMH-101 V.1 (Y: 48 N: 58 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A6 Floyd\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 56 N: 48 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A5 Harrison\Second Reading\ARI-65 V.3 (Y: 49 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-06-14 - House - A5 Harrison\Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A4 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-66 V.5 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A3 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-69 V.1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A2 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-71 V.2 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A1 Gillespie\Second Reading\ARI-68 V.1 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | Ch. SL 2012-143 | |
2012-07-02 | Veto Overridden | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-07-02 | Veto Overridden | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-01 | Vetoed 7/1/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-21 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-18 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-14 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 12 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 11 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 10 | |
2012-06-14 | Amendment Withdrawn 9 | |
2012-06-14 | Amendment 9 Offered | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 8 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 7 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 6 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Failed 5 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-06 | Ref To Com On Environment | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2012-06-06 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2012-06-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-23 | Re-ref Com On Commerce | |
2012-05-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1054 (Same As) 2012-05-23 - Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Finance