NC S810 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-533
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-533
Summary
Affordable Housing/No Discrimination.
Title
Affordable Housing/No Discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Douglas Berger [D] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. Eleanor Kinnaird [D] |
Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. William Purcell [D] | Sen. Joshua Stein [D] | Sen. Donald Vaughan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-533 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Ratified | |
2009-08-03 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-28 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-07-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-08 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S810 |