NC S8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bldg. Code Exempt/Airport Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bldg. Code Exempt/Airport Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Ch. SL 2017-104
2017-07-12 Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
2017-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
2017-06-30 Ratified
2017-06-30SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-30HouseConf Report Adopted
2017-06-30HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-30HouseConf Com Reported
2017-06-30SenateConf Report Adopted
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-30SenateConf Com Reported
2017-06-30HouseConf Com Appointed
2017-06-29SenateConf Com Appointed
2017-06-29SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-29SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2017-06-29HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-03-30HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-21HouseRef to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance
2017-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-20HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2017-03-16SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-03-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-03-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-03-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/15/2017
2017-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2017-03-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/14/2017
2017-03-09SenateReptd Fav
2017-03-08SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-08SenateReptd Fav
2017-02-16SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-02-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-02-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-02-02SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-01-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-01-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S8&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S8v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=23
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=890
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=512
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=522
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=906

Bill Comments

feedback