NC S796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Ch. SL 2020-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Ch. SL 2020-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Carteret Co. Bd. of Educ. Districts
Title
Carteret Co. Bd. of Educ. Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Ch. SL 2020-34 | |
2020-06-24 | Ratified | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2020-06-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2020 |
2020-06-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Filed |