NC S795 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Regular Message Received From Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Laurinburg-Maxton Airport Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Laurinburg-Maxton Airport Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2020-05-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2020-05-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-05-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-05-20SenateReptd Fav
2020-05-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-19SenateReptd Fav
2020-05-19SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-18SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback