NC S795 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excellent Public Schools Act
Title
Excellent Public Schools Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2012-06-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-05 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-04 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-04 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-05-31 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-05-31 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2012-05-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-05-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-29 | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2012-05-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-04-25 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2012-04-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Filed |