NC S773 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Goldston Satellite Annexations
Title
Goldston Satellite Annexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-22 | |
2022-06-30 | Ratified | |
2022-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-23 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 58.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |