NC S754 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nashville/Revised & Consolidated Charter
Title
Nashville/Revised & Consolidated Charter
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-20 | |
2022-06-30 | Ratified | |
2022-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Nash County
Nashville
Ratified
Session Laws
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Nash County
Nashville
Ratified
Session Laws