NC S754 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prevent Squatting in Foreclosed Real Property
Title
Prevent Squatting in Foreclosed Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] |
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/17/2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Filed |