NC S740 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Congressional Redistricting Plan 2021/CST-13
Title
Congressional Redistricting Plan 2021/CST-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-11-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | Ch. SL 2021-174 | |
2021-11-04 | Ratified | |
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/04/2021 |
2021-11-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-02 | House | Ref To Com On Redistricting |
2021-11-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Amend Tabled A1 |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Redistricting and Elections |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 201 | (n/a) | Citation Text |