NC S736 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Marc Basnight, Former Member
Title
Honor Marc Basnight, Former Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-21 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/21/2021 |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Adopted
Awards
Basnight
General Assembly
Honors & Memorials
Marc
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Resolutions
Simple
Awards
Basnight
General Assembly
Honors & Memorials
Marc
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Resolutions
Simple